Chew thiam keng
WebThiam Keng Chew is Former CEO/Executive Director at Ezion Holdings Ltd. See Thiam Keng Chew's compensation, career history, education, & memberships. WebEvents. The Lists. Chew Thiam Keng. Former banker Chew Thiam Keng created Ezion Holdings from an electrical wire maker he bought for US$6. The company, which now provides offshore marine services to the oil …
Chew thiam keng
Did you know?
WebApr 30, 2014 · The Board of Directors of Multi-Chem Limited announced the changes effective from April 30, 2014: Mr. Chew Thiam Keng retired from office at the conclusion of the annual general meeting held on 30... February 13, 2024 WebFormer banker Chew Thiam Keng created Ezion Holdings from an electrical wire maker he bought for US$6. The company, which now provides offshore marine services to the oil and gas industry, has a …
Web8 years ago Chew Thiam Keng retires as Multi-Chem director He also quitted as chairman of Nominating Committee and a member of Audit Committee and Renumeration … WebMay 9, 2014 · (L to R) Ezion chairman Lee Kian Soo and CEO Chew Thiam Keng. Ezion in strong start Ezion Holdings has made a strong start to the new financial year thanks to its expanding fleet.
WebMar 2, 2005 · Mr. Chew Thiam Keng, the Managing Director of KS Tech commented, "We are privileged to be working with GDI on this rig conversion project. Given the long lead time and high capital cost of ... WebMr. Chew Thiam Keng was appointed to the Board as Non-Executive Chairman on 20 February 2013 and was last re-elected on 24 April 2013. Mr. Chew is currently the Chief Executive Officer(‘CEO’) and Executive Director of Ezion Holdings Limited (‘Ezion’) and he was appointed to the Board of Ezion on 1 March 2007.
WebOct 11, 2024 · Thiam Keng Chew: Non-Executive Chairman: Yee Seng Cheng: Independent Non-Executive Director: Chen Yang Lim: Independent Non-Executive Director: Simon de Villiers Rudolph: Independent Non-Executive ...
WebSCS Fellowship comprises individuals who hold senior tech positions and have an established reputation of eminence or authority in the field of tech. As a Fellow of SCS, the individual must have advanced SCS as the premier infocomm society in Singapore and made positive influence to the tech community. Honouring our SCS Fellows (FSCS): crystal glass trophiesWebAug 4, 2024 · PRESENT DIRECTORSHIPS - CHEW THIAM KENG Name of Company or Firm Company Registration Number Nature of Interest / Director of Member Date of Appointment PHARMESIS INTERNATIONAL LTD 200309641E INDEPENDENT DIRECTOR 24 AUGUST 2004 EZION HOLDINGS LIMITED 199904364E EXECUTIVE … dwellingup real estateWebName of lawyer: Chew Kiat Jinn Law firm: Avant Law LLC Email address: [email protected] Contact number: 9770 7436 Name of lawyer: Chew Siang Tong Law firm: ST Chew & Partners Email address: [email protected] Contact number: 6438 4876 / 6438 6362 Name of lawyer: Chye Kit Soon Law firm: Chan Jer … crystal glass tile backsplashWebCompany Description:? Key Principal:Chew Thiam Keng See more contacts Industry:Support Activities for Water Transportation , crystal glass \\u0026 mirrorWebThe Board of YHM Group announced the appointment of Chew Thiam Keng as Non-Executive Director and Chairman. Mr Chew, 51, was appointed as the Executive Director of Ezion Holdings Limited ("Ezion") on 1 March 2007 and was subsequently appointed as the Chief Executive Officer ("CEO") on 1 June 2007, according to a YHM Group report. dwellingup pump trackWeb8.1 RE-ELECTION OF MR. CHEW THIAM KENG – RESOLUTION 2 Resolution 2 dealt with the re-election of Mr. Chew Thiam Keng as a Director of the Company. As Mr. Chew Thiam Keng was interested in this matter, he passed the chair to Mr. Tan Ser Ko to preside Resolution 2. Mr. Tan Ser Ko informed that Mr. Chew Thiam Keng, upon re-election as … crystal glass typesWebThiam Keng Chew. Age : 60. Public asset : 868,758 USD. Linked companies : Charisma Energy Services Limited. Summary. Thiam Keng Chew holds the position of Non … crystal glass tea cups