WebbMichael J Toussaint Anna Toussaint. 57 Spielman Hwy Burlington CT 06013. Features. Built in 1814; 2 story; 2 bathrooms; ... Ashner R & E Llc. 224 Spielman Hwy Burlington CT 06013. Features. Built in 1952; 1 story; 1 bathroom; 6 rooms; ... Sandra L Gagnon. Daniel R Gagnon Sandra L Gagnon. 486 Spielman Hwy Burlington CT 06013. Features. Built … Webb24 sep. 2024 · Two investors in CBL Properties have acquired more than 5 percent of the REIT, requiring a notification to the SEC. An SEC statement filed jointly by Exeter Capital and Michael L. Ashner reports they have acquired a 5.9 percent stake in CBL Properties. To view the full filing, click here. CBL Properties owns and manages a national portfolio …
Did you know?
Webb11 nov. 2024 · Michael Ashner runs activist fund Winthrop Capital Partners and has taken an undisclosed stake in Unilever. He’s agitating for other shareholders to push the … Webb15 nov. 2024 · PN2773 - 315 nominees by the U.S. President for Coast Guard, 117th Congress (2024-2024)
Webb(a) Designed such disclosure controls and procedures, or caused such disclosure controls and procedures to be designed under our supervision, to ensure that material … Webb15 juni 2024 · Michael L Ashner, Director Alexander David Greene, Director Gary L Rosenthal, Director Marc Weisman, Director Ronald R Green, See Remarks States International, Inc Oil, 10% owner Ronald Gilbertson, Director Carolyn J Stone, SVP, CFO & Treasurer Bradley J Dodson, President & CEO Barclay Brewer, Vice President and …
WebbMichael L. Ashner is the primary contact at Winthrop Realty Trust. Winthrop Realty Trust generates approximately USD 7,184,762 in revenue annually, and employs around 50 … Webb23 juli 2010 · Michael L Ashner, age 76: 3653 Briargrove Ln, Dallas, TX 75287: Michael A Ashner: 4605 Ocean Dr, Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308: Michael Ashner Places of …
WebbThe Registered Agent on file for this company is Richard J. Mccready and is located at 1 International Pl.,12th Fl,, Boston, MA 02110. The company's principal address is 1 …
Webb10 apr. 2024 · Lawrence Gray biography. Lawrence L. Gray serves as Independent Trustee of the Company. He is the Chief Executive Officer of GrayCo, Inc., a private real estate company that owns and manages apartment communities, master planned community investments and timberlands located throughout the Southeast region of the … sphere certificationWebbMichael Lee Ashner is an attorney registered with , admitted in 1979. The current status is Due to reregister within 30 days. The employer name is MICHAEL L ASHNER. The business address is 2 Jericho Plz Ste 111, Jericho, NY 11753-1681. sphere chair corduroyWebbReference is made to the Settlement Agreement (the “Agreement”), dated as of October 23, 2016, by and among WW Investors LLC, Michael L. Ashner and Steven Witkoff … sphere cat treeWebb16 maj 2024 · JERICHO, N.Y., May 16, 2024 (GLOBE NEWSWIRE) -- Michael L. Ashner on behalf of Winthrop Strategic Real Estate Fund, currently a less than 1% stockholder of New York City REIT, Inc. (NYSE: NYC)... sphere chair rockingWebb31 mars 2024 · On November 9, 2024, Michael L. Ashner was appointed as a member of the Board of Managers. As of November 9, 2024, the Board of Managers is comprised of Randolph C. Read, ... sphere cat towerWebb25 maj 2024 · Michael Ashner, Chairman and Chief Executive Officer of Winthrop, provided the following comments: " Winthrop has been an active real estate investor and operator for over 30 years. sphere chair targetWebb29 sep. 2024 · CBL Properties (NYSE:CBL) today announced that Michael L. Ashner has resigned from CBL’s Board of Directors effective September 29, 2024, for personal sphere chairs